Registrar
S.No | Name | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
1 | Prof. G. Sankara Rajulu | 11.07.1985 | 31.08.1986 |
2 | Thiru. N. Thirunavukkarasu | 31.08.1986 | 31.05.1988 |
3 | Dr. M. A. Arulanandam | 01.06.1988 | 30.06.1990 |
4 | Thiru. N. Thirunavukkarasu | 01.07.1990 | 26.09.1990 |
5 | Thiru. K. Jayaraman | 26.09.1990 | 17.09.1992 |
6 | Dr. S. Nilavalagan (i/c) | 17.09.1992 | 16.10.1992 |
7 | Dr. V. B. S. Rajan | 16.10.1992 | 03.11.1993 |
8 | Dr. S. Nilavalagan (i/c) | 03.11.1993 | 02.05.1994 |
9 | Dr. S. Sakthivel (i/c) | 02.05.1994 | 06.05.1996 |
10 | Dr. Dhanasekaran (i/c) | 06.05.1996 | 03.02.1998 |
11 | Dr. M. A. Arulanandam (i/c) | 04.02.1998 | 13.01.1999 |
12 | Prof. M. Ananthanarayanan | 14.01.1999 | 05.12.2000 |
13 | Prof. M. Karunanidhi (i/c) | 06.12.2000 | 31.05.2001 |
14 | Thiru. R. Dhandapani (i/c) | 01.06.2001 | 08.05.2003 |
15 | Dr. R. Dhandapani | 09.05.2003 | 15.04.2008 |
16 | Dr. E. Ilamathian | 16.04.2008 | 15.04.2009 |
17 | Dr. A. Shenbagavalli (i/c) | 30.04.2009 | 06.10.2010 |
18 | Dr. K. Manimekalai (i/c) | 07.10.2010 | 17.07.2012 |
19 | Dr. T. R. Gurumoorthy (i/c) | 18.07.2012 | 25.11.2012 |
20 | Dr. V. Manicavasagam | 26.11.2012 | 25.11.2015 |
21 | Dr. V. Balachandran (i/c) | 26.11.2015 | 21.12.2017 |
22 | Dr. H. Gurumallesh Prabu | 22.12.2017 | 21.12.2020 |
23 | Dr. B. Vaseeharan (i/c) | 21.12.2020 | 28.05.2021 |
24 | Dr. C. Sekar (i/c) | 28.05.2021 | 06.05.2022 |
25 | Dr. S. Rajamohan (i/c) | 06.05.2022 | 29.12.2023 |
26 | Dr. A. Senthil Rajan | 29.12.2023 | Present |
Controller of Examinations
S.No | Name | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
1 | Thiru. N. Thirunavukkarasu | 15.07.1985 | 28.02.1987 |
2 | Thiru. S. Saratchandran (i/c) | 01.03.1987 | 31.05.1988 |
3 | Thiru. N. Thirunavukkarasu | 01.06.1988 | 30.06.1991 |
4 | Thiru. K. Jeyaraman (i/c) | 30.06.1991 | 11.03.1992 |
5 | Dr. S. Nilavalagan | 11.03.1992 | 02.05.1994 |
6 | Dr. K. Chandrasekara Rao (i/c) | 02.05.1994 | 01.08.1996 |
7 | Dr. N. Sridharan (i/c) | 02.08.1996 | 07.11.1997 |
8 | Dr. RM. Chidambaram (i/c) | 07.11.1997 | 08.05.1998 |
9 | Dr.S. Sakthivel (i/c) | 08.05.1998 | 12.04.1999 |
10 | Thiru. M. Karunanidhi | 12.04.1999 | 31.05.2001 |
11 | Dr. K. Pown Radha (i/c) | 31.05.2001 | 31.05.2004 |
12 | Dr. R. Dhandapani (i/c) | 01.06.2004 | 16.06.2004 |
13 | Dr. P. Sivakesan (i/c) | 17.06.2004 | 27.11.2004 |
14 | Dr. P. Sivakesan | 27.11.2004 | 03.06.2005 |
15 | Dr. R. Dhandapani (i/c) | 03.06.2005 | 05.06.2005 |
16 | Dr. P. Sivakesan (i/c) | 06.06.2005 | 08.03.2007 |
17 | Dr. V. Manickavasagam (i/c) | 08.03.2007 | 28.03.2008 |
18 | Dr. V. Manickavasagam | 28.03.2008 | 07.03.2012 |
19 | Dr. K. Uthayasuriyan (i/c) | 08.03.2012 | 25.11.2012 |
20 | Dr. K. Uthayasuriyan | 26.11.2012 | 25.11.2015 |
21 | Dr. H. Gurumallesh Prabu (i/c) | 26.11.2015 | 21.12.2017 |
22 | Dr. P. Shakkthivel | 22.12.2017 | 03.10.2018 |
23 | Dr. K. Uthayasuriyan (i/c) | 03.10.2018 | 12.05.2020 |
24 | Dr. E. Kannapiran (i/c) | 13.05.2020 | 28.12.2023 |
25 | Dr. M. Jothibasu | 29.12.2023 | Present |
Finance Officer
S.No | Name | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
1 | Thiru. G. Sankararajulu | 11.07.1985 | 09.01.1986 |
2 | Thiru. P. Narasingam | 10.01.1986 | 12.05.1987 |
3 | Thiru. S. A. Pugaleeswaran | 13.05.1987 | 21.08.1988 |
4 | Thiru. P. Thiagarajan | 22.08.1988 | 05.07.1990 |
5 | Thiru. N. Thirunavukkarasu (i/c) | 06.07.1990 | 21.08.1990 |
6 | Thiru. K. Krishnan | 22.08.1990 | 01.04.1992 |
7 | Thiru. P. Rajaram | 02.04.1992 | 31.08.1993 |
8 | Thiru. T. Renganathan | 01.09.1993 | 30.01.1996 |
9 | Thiru. R. Dhandapani (i/c) | 31.01.1996 | 05.05.1996 |
10 | Dr. P. Santhanaraghavan | 06.05.1996 | 16.04.1997 |
11 | Thiru. R. Sankarligam | 17.04.1997 | 01.03.1998 |
12 | Thiru. S. Subburathinam | 02.03.1998 | 01.03.2002 |
13 | Thiru. R. Dhandapani (i/c) | 02.03.2002 | 10.03.2002 |
14 | Thiru. K. K. Kaleeswara Subramanian | 11.03.2002 | 21.12.2005 |
15 | Thiru. R. Dhandapani (i/c) | 22.12.2005 | 03.01.2006 |
16 | Thiru. R. Boominathan | 04.01.2006 | 12.07.2010 |
17 | Dr. T. R. Gurumoorthy (i/c) | 13.07.2010 | 22.08.2010 |
18 | Thiru. U. Ravisankar | 23.08.2010 | 14.05.2012 |
19 | Dr. T. R. Gurumoorthy (i/c) | 15.05.2012 | 07.06.2012 |
20 | Thiru. A.M. Partheepan | 07.06.2012 | 02.06.2014 |
21 | Thiru. V. Ramdas | 02.06.2014 | 31.05.2015 |
22 | Thiru. K. Krishnan | 31.05.2015 | 29.02.2016 |
23 | Thiru. S. Murugaraj | 01.03.2016 | 28.02.2018 |
24 | Dr. T. R. Gurumoorthy (i/c) | 01.03.2018 | 03.10.2018 |
25 | Dr. V. Balachandran (i/c) | 04.10.2018 | 31.05.2019 |
26 | Dr. T. R. Gurumoorthy (i/c) | 01.06.2019 | 05.06.2019 |
27 | Dr. S. Chandramohan (i/c) | 06.06.2019 | 03.03.2020 |
28 | Thiru S. Karunanithi | 04.03.2020 | 26.02.2021 |
29 | Thiru R. Pandian | 26.02.2021 | 23.02.2024 |
Director of Distance Education
S.No | Name | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
1 | Dr. V. S. Alagappan (Co-ordinator) | 01.06.1992 | 31.05.1994 |
2 | Dr. S. Sudalaimuthu (i/c) | 01.06.1994 | 21.08.2003 |
3 | Dr. S. Sudalaimuthu | 22.08.2003 | 21.08.2007 |
4 | Dr. V. Balachandran (i/c) | 22.08.2007 | 28.03.2008 |
5 | Dr. V. Balachandran | 28.03.2008 | 27.03.2011 |
6 | Dr. K. Manimekalai (i/c) | 28.03.2011 | 31.03.2011 |
7 | Dr. P. Manisankar (i/c) | 01.04.2011 | 25.11.2012 |
8 | Dr. T. R. Gurumoorthy | 26.11.2012 | 25.11.2015 |
9 | Dr. P. Sivakumar (i/c) | 26.11.2015 | 28.01.2018 |
10 | Dr. S. Rajaram (i/c) | 29.01.2018 | 31.05.2019 |
11 | Dr. K. Alamelu (i/c) | 01.06.2019 | 21.04.2020 |
12 | Dr. K. Manimekalai (i/c) | 22.04.2020 | 14.12.2021 |
13 | Dr. T. R. Gurumoorthy (i/c) | 14.12.2021 | 11.04.2023 |
14 | Dr. H. Gurumallesh Prabu | 12.04.2023 | 28.12.2023 |
15 | Dr. E. Kannapiran | 29.12.2023 | Present |
College Development Council
S.No | Name of the Dean | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
1 | Dr. R. Thirumalaisamy | 25.05.2005 | 30.06.2006 |
2 | Dr. S. Mohan | 01.07.2006 | 30.04.2007 |
3 | Dr.S.Kaliyamoorthy (i/c) | 04.05.2007 | 17.08.2008 |
4 | Dr. T. R. Gurumoorthy | 18.08.2008 | 18.08.2011 |
5 | Dr.T.R.Gurumoorthy (i/c) | 19.08.2011 | 17.07.2012 |
6 | Dr. S. Rajamohan (i/c) | 18.07.2012 | 23.11.2012 |
7 | Dr.M.Senthil | 26.11.2012 | 25.11.2015 |
8 | Dr. S. Rajamohan (i/c) | 26.11.2015 | 16.11.2018 |
9 | Dr. M. Senthil (i/c) | 19.11.2018 | 28.02.2019 |
10 | Dr. E. Kannapiran (i/c) | 04.03.2019 | 21.02.2020 |
11 | Dr.A.Veera Ravi (i/c) | 24.02.2020 | 04.09.2020 |
12 | Dr.S.Thanuskodi (i/c) | 07.09.2020 | 24.12.2020 |
13 | Dr.V.Sivakumar (i/c) | 28.12.2020 | Present |